03. Multiplication of numbers with ending zeroes: Extended Exercise

Note: use a scrap paper if you need. Some of the problems may include double or triple digit multiplication. Remember to shift when you multiply double digits or triple digits. 4th graders normally forget this.


20 X 10 = 



60 x 80 =



70 X 600 = 



750 X 8 =



20 x 10 =



20 x 1000 = 



350 x 800 = 


2300 x 250 =


5400 x 3050 =